The Official Star Trek Movie Forum

The Official Star Trek Movie Forum (http://www.startrekmovie.com/forums/index.php)
-   Off Topic Discussions (http://www.startrekmovie.com/forums/forumdisplay.php?f=4)
-   -   Any math majors in here? (http://www.startrekmovie.com/forums/showthread.php?t=12181)

Quark 11-06-2013 12:27 PM

Any math majors in here?
 
Are there any of you guys that are good at math? I'm taking a math class right now and I just suck at it. Math has never really been my strong suit...ever.

omegaman 11-06-2013 01:26 PM

Quote:

Originally Posted by Quark (Post 330085)
Are there any of you guys that are good at math? I'm taking a math class right now and I just suck at it. Math has never really been my strong suit...ever.

Amen to that. No Maths genius here either! But, I get by.

martok2112 11-06-2013 02:16 PM

All those years in school I was told to find "x", and never once in the real world have I ever had to find "x".....so, sorry, no math major here either. :)

NCC-73515 11-06-2013 03:39 PM

Was good at some parts, bad at others...

LCARS 24 11-06-2013 07:03 PM

If you want to freak out your math professor, tell him/her you know how to draw a triangle with three right angles. But maybe he/she already knows.

How? On the surface of a sphere. Draw a line from anywhere on the equator to one of the poles, next from that pole at a right angle back to the equator, then back to the starting point, forming a 270-degree triangle. It's a nonplanar triangle (not drawn on a plane).

A simple trick of a multiplying a two-digit number by 11 often comes in handy. You add the two digits and stick the sum in the middle, but if it's more than 9 you have to carry. So 24 x 11 is 264, but in the case of 78 x 11, since 7+8 is 15, you stick only the five in the middle and carry the 1 (add it to your original 7), making the answer 858. This is not really math taught in school so much as a trick for doing arithmetic in your head, more or less made obsolete by modern calculators.

Another trick like that of my own invention is less often useful but can be impressive. To multiply 19 x 21 in your head, subtract 1 from the square of 20. That 1 is actually the square of the mutual distance from 20. So the answer is 399. For 18 x 22, it's 396 (20 squared minus 2 squared), and so on. For example, 25 x 35 would be 875 (30 squared minus 5 squared), and 15 x 17 is 255.

Not school math, just a little fun.

horatio 11-07-2013 03:27 AM

Quote:

Originally Posted by martok2112 (Post 330089)
All those years in school I was told to find "x", and never once in the real world have I ever had to find "x".....so, sorry, no math major here either. :)

It can be exciting. ;)



About maths, my thesis is that all children are naturally curious about everything. Then school comes along and ruins it for them. In the case of maths this is achieved via over-rigidity and -formality (here is Feynman on how school teaches algorithms but fails to make pupils understand what they are actually doing) and presenting tools to solve problems without presenting any real problems.

martok2112 11-07-2013 07:31 AM

Quote:

Originally Posted by horatio (Post 330093)
It can be exciting. ;)



Ha ha ha......yeah, the one time when we actually DID need to find "x". :D


All times are GMT -8. The time now is 11:10 PM.

Powered by vBulletin® Version 3.6.8
Copyright ©2000 - 2014, Jelsoft Enterprises Ltd.
Copyright © 2009 by Paramount Pictures. STAR TREK and all related
marks and logos are trademarks of CBS Studios Inc. All Rights Reserved.